HI HB1971 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 034, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 034, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Kunoa Cattle Company, LLC, to fund the construction of a multi-species livestock farm, expansion of the slaughter and processing infrastructure, development of distribution assets and agritourism services, and expansion of renewable energy assets. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Kunoa Cattle Company, Llc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Act 034, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134). |
2018-06-13 | House | Act 034, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Keohokalole, McDermott excused (2). |
2018-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 678). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 673). |
2018-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 630) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2952) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 294). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 95-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-31-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2434 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 35