HI HB1965 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts civil asset forfeiture to specific, limited cases. Raises the burden of proof for property forfeiture to clear and convincing evidence. Authorizes the use of certain forfeited property by local or state agencies for a limited time. Directs forfeiture proceeds to certain involved state and local governments and to the general fund. Amends the allowable uses of moneys in the criminal forfeiture fund. Requires the Attorney General to adopt rules. Advances the deadline for the Attorney General to report to the Legislature on the Hawaii omnibus criminal forfeiture act. Effective 1/1/2222. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Property Forfeiture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Clark, Har, Nakamura, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |