HI HB1962 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restores the allocation of conveyance tax collections to the rental housing revolving fund to 50 percent. (HB1962 HD1)
Title
Rental Housing Revolving Fund; Conveyance Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 12-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2016-02-01 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-01-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-01-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2093 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.