HI HB1960 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the mortgagee in an alternate power of sale foreclosure procedure to attach a copy of the original, signed mortgage agreement and any amendments thereto to the notice of default.
Title
Alternate Power of Sale Foreclosure Procedure
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-03-10 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-15 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1960&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1960_.HTM |