HI HB1947 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for one full-time equivalent position within the department of health to implement a systematic vision and hearing program and other operating expenses of the program.
Title
Vision and Hearing Screening Program; Department of Health; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2334 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1947&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1947_.HTM |