HI HB1947 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals applicability of state income tax to rollovers made by employees of state and county agencies and tax-exempt organizations from qualifying annuity plans and qualifying deferred compensation plans to eligible retirement plans or individual retirement accounts. (HB1947 HD1)
Title
Income Tax; Employee Annuities; Compensation Plans
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-26-10 3:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Re-Referred to LBR/WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 177). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Sagum. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-18-10 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 26 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-15 | (H) Pending introduction. |