HI HB1929 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to renegotiate an existing, or issue a new, ground lease for the Front Street Apartments affordable housing project before the corporation's requirement to initiate condemnation proceedings is triggered. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 07-02-20 12:30PM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3625) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 37-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2279 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36