HI HB1925 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a financial and performance audit of the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-29 | House | Re-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LMG/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2372 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to GVO/HWN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1925&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1925_.HTM |