HI HB1907 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the remote sale and shipment of cigarettes and tobacco products, including electronic smoking devices, to consumers except to licensed wholesalers or dealers. Imposes criminal liability for a violation. (HB1907 HD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 340-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2). |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Electronic Smoking Device
Internet Marketing and Purchase of Cigarettes and Tobacco Products Act of 2018
Internet Sale
Mail Order
Remote Sale
Internet Marketing and Purchase of Cigarettes and Tobacco Products Act of 2018
Internet Sale
Mail Order
Remote Sale