HI HB1882 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes ranked choice voting for special federal elections and special elections of vacant county council seats.
Title
Relating To Ranked Choice Voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2162 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 047, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1882&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1882_.HTM |