HI HB1871 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from the State Code of Ethics' prohibition against acceptance of gifts by legislators and employees, foreign protocol gifts, gifts of aloha, invitations to certain events, and meals, under certain conditions. Defines foreign protocol gifts and gifts of aloha.
Title
Relating To Gifts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-16-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-16-22 at 9:30 AM. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2714 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Code of Ethics
Exceptions
Foreign Protocol Gifts
Gifts
Gifts of Aloha
Invitation to Events
Standards of Conduct
Exceptions
Foreign Protocol Gifts
Gifts
Gifts of Aloha
Invitation to Events
Standards of Conduct
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1871&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1871_.HTM |