HI HB186 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB186
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the mining, extraction, and removal of minerals from the seabed in all state marine waters, under certain conditions. Prohibits the issuance of any permit for or in connection with the development or operation of any facility or infrastructure associated with the mining, extraction, or removal of minerals from the seabed within state marine waters. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 9) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB186 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
SB376 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
SB376 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).