HI HB1854 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DOA, in conjunction with the Hawaii Ant Lab, to identify best practices for the treatment of little fire ants. Requires DOA to post those best practices on its website. Adds any application that may defeat the best practices for the treatment of little fire ants, as identified by the DOA, to the prohibited acts of pesticides. Clarifies that training for invasive species be based on the best available technology and best practices in a manner consistent with state and federal laws. Effective upon approval. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Little Fire Ants.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 420). |
2020-07-08 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 07-06-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384). |
2020-07-06 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-02 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 558) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-02-20. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3731) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 06-30-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 31). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 607-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-13-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2474 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36