HI HB1851 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a commissioner to attend by teleconference or videoconference a public hearing of the public utilities commission, except for a contested case hearing, including allowing a commissioner who resides on an island other than Oahu to attend a public hearing of the commission held on Oahu and a commissioner residing on the island of Oahu to attend a public hearing of the commission held on an island other than Oahu. Enables a member of the commission who is a resident of a county other than the city and county of Honolulu to receive per diem compensation. Enables a person's island of residence to be used as a criterion when determining the person's qualification to serve as a commissioner. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Commissioners; Teleconference; Videoconference; Per Diem; Qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cullen Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 541) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3579) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3055) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 228). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-03-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-16 2:00PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-01-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2641 (Same As) 2016-02-26 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.