HI HB1850 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Feb 21 @ 1:30 pm in Conference Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the chief energy officer to contract with Hawaii not-for-profit entities to administer expenditures from the energy security special fund for the purposes set forth in section 201-12.8, HRS. Increases the allocation from the state environmental response, energy, and food security tax for deposit to the energy security special fund from 5 cents to 15 cents per barrel or fractional part of a barrel of petroleum product. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Energy Security Special Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649-20), recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:45AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-31HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Say excused (3).
2020-01-31HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
2020-01-28HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2020-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-28-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to EEP, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2559 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback