HI HB184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Office of the Governor, the Department of Agriculture, and the Department of Health for disaster relief and recovery for the County of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/WLH/HSG/HSH on Friday, 02-08-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to PVM/WLH/HSG/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB184 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
SB166 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 059, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
SB166 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 059, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
DOH
Hawaii County Mayor's Package
HDOA
Kilauea Eruption Disaster Relief and Recovery
Office of the Governor
State Budget
DOH
Hawaii County Mayor's Package
HDOA
Kilauea Eruption Disaster Relief and Recovery
Office of the Governor
State Budget
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=184&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB184_.HTM |