HI HB1839 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a water service holders mailing address, amounts paid by or owed to the service holder for water or sewer services, and an individuals service location shall not be made available for public inspection or duplication.
Title
Public Access; Water Service Consumption Data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-23-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-13-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-13 | (H) Prefiled |