HI HB1832 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the dissemination of information from the juvenile justice information system to law enforcement agencies for purposes of the administration of law enforcement and law enforcement agency employment.
Title
Juvenile Justice Information System; Law Enforcement Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2421 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1832&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1832_.HTM |