HI HB1823 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases capacity limits on net energy metering and establishes excess energy volumes for systems installed after June 30, 2016. (HB1823 HD1)
Title
Net Energy Metering
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-29-16. |
2016-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 518-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |