HI HB1807 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the works of art special fund's one per cent transfer requirement shall apply only to capital improvement appropriations for the original construction of state buildings. Appropriates funds for performing arts initiatives and expanded arts programing in schools. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Works Of Art Special Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, La Chica, Perruso, Pierick voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: none; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Alcos; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kapela; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Sayama. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-14-24 10:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Capital Improvement Appropriations
Expenditure Ceiling
Performing Arts
School Arts Programs
State Foundation on Culture and the Arts
Works of Art Special Fund
Capital Improvement Appropriations
Expenditure Ceiling
Performing Arts
School Arts Programs
State Foundation on Culture and the Arts
Works of Art Special Fund