HI HB1802 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Self-Governance Oversight, to be headed by the condominium czar, within the Department of the Attorney General. Appropriates funds for administrative costs associated with the establishment of the Office of Self-Governance Oversight. Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to conduct a study. (HB1802 HD1)
Title
Condominiums; Office of Self-Governance Oversight; Study; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 2:00 PM |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |