HI HB1779 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the second year of a program to train incarcerated women to be general education development tutors for their peers, provide college correspondence courses for women in the women's community correctional center, and provide reentry and transition services for women wanting to continue their education post incarceration. Enables partnerships with the Department of Education, University of Hawaii, and Department of Public Safety. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Incarcerated Women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2640 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DOE
Education
Incarcerated
PSD
Reentry
Transition Services
UH
Women's Caucus
Women's Prison Project
DOE
Education
Incarcerated
PSD
Reentry
Transition Services
UH
Women's Caucus
Women's Prison Project