HI HB1773 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to continue to administer Housing First Programs for chronically homeless individuals. Appropriates funds for the Rapid Re-housing Program for homeless working individuals or families who are ready to rent permanent housing to obtain and maintain permanent housing. Appropriates funds for additional staffing to manage the rent supplement program. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Housing; Homeless; Rapid Re-housing Program; Housing First; Rent Supplement Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Harimoto, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Green, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 77). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2733 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.