HI HB1771 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the circuit court or family court to issue a material witness order in cases initiated through felony complaint, indictment, or information. (HB1771 HD1)
Title
Relating To Material Witness Orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 5). |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-16 | House | Deferred one day 02-20-18. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-25-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2174 (Same As) 2018-07-05 - Act 099, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).