HI HB1769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the allowable fees for reimbursing expert witnesses who are legally required to attend state court or grand jury criminal proceedings. (HB1769 HD1)
Title
Relating To Expert Witness Fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-25-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2172 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 833).