HI HB1758 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that code compliance review of plans for construction applicable to the specific engineering field is considered lawful experience in engineering work for employees of municipalities. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Professional Engineers.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Richards, Awa. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima Chair; Onishi, Sayama, Pierick. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 691). |
2024-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 484) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 212). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Code Compliance Review of Plans
Lawful Experience in Engineering Work
Licensure
Municipality Employees
Professional Engineers
Qualifications
Lawful Experience in Engineering Work
Licensure
Municipality Employees
Professional Engineers
Qualifications