HI HB1756 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 097, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 097, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires submittal of electronic fingerprints for criminal history record checks from nurse licensure applicants and nurse licensure renewal applicants. Authorizes the Board of Nursing to conduct investigations of applicants for licensure, renewal, and reactivation, request criminal history records of qualified applicants, and request criminal history records of persons issued licenses. (HB1756 CD1)
Title
Nursing; Licensure; Registration; Renewal; Criminal History Record Checks; Board of Nursing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 097, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 097, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 40-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 40-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, Cachola, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Rhoads, Cachola Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Kidani, Ruderman. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 533) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3534) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM/JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2016-02-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-16 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-03-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2677 (Same As) 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).