HI HB1756 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - (S) Re-Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - (S) Re-Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the campaign spending law to: (1) Define "matching payment period"; (2) Change filing deadlines and requirements; and (3) Require a noncandidte committee to identify the candidate committee or noncandidate committee and the amount and date of the contribution made to it, and identify the candidate supported or opposed by an independent expenditure. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB1752 HD1)
Title
Campaign Spending
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | (S) Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 77). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-12 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura, Say excused (2). | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-24-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-13 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2053 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - (S) Referred to JDL.