HI HB1748 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - Recommitted to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - Recommitted to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that all animal parts, products, or items containing prohibited animal parts or products involved in the commission of wildlife trafficking or certain hunting offenses shall be considered contraband to be forfeited to and disposed of by the State. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Wildlife Offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Senate | Recommitted to JDC. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 295). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (8) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2188 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Enrolled to Governor.