HI HB1746 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires anyone harvesting forest trees or plants for commercial purposes to obtain a license and submit monthly reports to DLNR.
Title
Commercial Forest Products; Logging; Trees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2532 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - The committee on WLA deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1746&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1746_.HTM |