HI HB174 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 213, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 213, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage of orthodontic treatment for orofacial anomalies. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Health Insurance; Orthodontic Treatment; Orofacial Anomalies
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Act 213, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). |
2015-07-06 | House | Act 213, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 110). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 110) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Kobayashi, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, English Co-Chairs. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Takayama, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 515) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 156). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-06-15 11:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-15 at 11:30 AM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB306 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.