HI HB1739 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers from requiring, requesting, or coercing employees or potential employees to provide access to their personal social media accounts, subject to certain exemptions. (HB1739 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Account; Privacy; Employment; Social Media

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-11SenateVetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
2016-07-11HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
2016-06-27HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227)
2016-06-27SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227)
2016-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2016-05-04HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2016-05-03SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
2016-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 59-16).
2016-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
2016-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 59-16) as amended in (CD 1).
2016-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2016-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Rhoads, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2016-04-28HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-16 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 325.
2016-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 11:00AM in conference room 325.
2016-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2016-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2016-04-19HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656).
2016-04-19SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, Shimabukuro.
2016-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2016-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Rhoads Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola.
2016-04-08SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392).
2016-04-07HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2016-04-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 413) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-04-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
2016-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16.
2016-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2016-04-04SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3304) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2016-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele.
2016-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2016-03-11SenateRe-Referred to JDL.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to CPH, JDL.
2016-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 217).
2016-03-08HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-04HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
2016-03-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nakashima.
2016-02-24HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2016-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-25-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2016-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-19HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2016-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-19-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
2016-02-08HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2016-02-02HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har.
2016-01-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2016-01-29HouseThe committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2016-01-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-29-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2016-01-25HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 1
2016-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-21HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback