HI HB1715 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 32, SLH 2017, by changing the phrase "the greenhouse gas emissions statewide" to "greenhouse gas emissions."
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1715&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1715_.HTM |