HI HB1706 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Act 120, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Act 120, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets a flat fine of $200 for parking a vehicle on a bicycle lane or pathway. (HB1706 CD1)
Title
Parking a Vehicle on a Bicycle Lane or Pathway; Fine
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Act 120, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221). |
2014-06-23 | House | Act 120, on 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 27-14). |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 27-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads, Takayama Co-Chairs; McDermott Member. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: English Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3354) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2962) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to TIA, WAM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to TIA, JDL. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 42). |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Kawakami. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-07-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2732 (Same As) 2014-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 29