HI HB1693 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the household income level and unit availability eligibility requirements for the provision of low-income housing and mixed-income rental project loans and grants made from the Rental Housing Revolving Fund. (HB1693 HD1)
Title
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |