HI HB1666 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to establish designated smoking areas on public sidewalks by 12/31/2024. Beginning 1/1/2025, prohibits smoking on public sidewalks unless within a designated smoking area.
Title
Relating To Smoking.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1666&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1666_.HTM |