HI HB1664 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Act 011, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Act 011, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that permanent and temporary fireworks storage buildings or structures and buildings or facilities where redistribution activities are performed comply with currently adopted county building or fire codes or latest edition of nationally recognized standards. (HB1664 HD1)
Title
Fireworks Storage
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Act 011, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2014-04-16 | House | Act 011, on 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2014-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-03-31 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 416). |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-14. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3145) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2933) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 234). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro. |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-24-14. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-19-14 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-02-06 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, Yamane, McDermott. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-06-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to PBS, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Prefiled |