HI HB1662 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide homelessness shelter and housing data clearinghouse within the department of human services to be administered by the governor's coordinator on homelessness. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2371 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Human Services
Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness
Homelessness
Statewide Shelter and Housing Data Clearinghouse
Department of Human Services
Governor's Coordinator on Homelessness
Homelessness
Statewide Shelter and Housing Data Clearinghouse