HI HB1659 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that noncandidate committee organizational reports include information regarding contributions. (HB1659 HD1)
Title
Relating To Organizational Reports Of Noncandidate Committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 268). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 887-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-09-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2154 (Same As) 2018-07-05 - Act 081, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).