HI HB1651 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies certain certification, renewal, and violation processes of vehicle inspectors who conduct vehicle safety inspections under the DOT. Repeals section 286-85, HRS, which requires reconstructed vehicles to obtain a special inspection and certification. Takes effect on approval. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Vehicle Inspections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-17-20 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2020-03-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2020-03-13SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3407) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 128).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-13HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426-20), recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-10HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
2020-02-05HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2020-01-31HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-21HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-13HousePrefiled.

Same As/Similar To

SB2693 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback