HI HB1626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to establish a compliance credits pilot program for probationers that comply with their conditions of supervision.
Title
Relating To A Probation Compliance Credits Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2395 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1626&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1626_.HTM |