HI HB1618 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Act 104, 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Act 104, 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that at least one member of the board of land and natural resources, other than the member appointed for having a background in conservation and natural resources, have demonstrated expertise in native Hawaiian traditional and customary practices. (HB1618 CD1)
Title
OHA Package; Board of Land and Natural Resources; Composition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Act 104, 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2014-06-23 | House | Act 104, on 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Wooley excused (2). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 54-14). |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 54-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Hanohano, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday, 04-22-14 at 2:20PM in Conference Room 224. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Solomon Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Hanohano, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matsumoto Member. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 408). |
2014-04-01 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-03-31 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-31-14. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3139) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-14 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HWN. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 45-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Fale. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Fale. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 01-27-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-10 | House | Prefiled |