HI HB1618 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the statewide economic development program of the Hawaii small business development center network.
Title
Hawaii Small Business Development Center Network; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Nakashima, Berg, Bertram, Hanohano, Manahan, Rhoads, Shimabukuro, Takumi, Yamane, Ching, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takai. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02/03/09 2:00 PM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HED, EBM, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1245 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1618&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1618_.HTM |