HI HB1616 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the total county allocation under the TAT to fund lifeguard and emergency medical services personnel positions in the counties. Repeals the emergency medical services special fund.
Title
Counties; Lifeguards; Emergency Medical Services Personnel; TAT; Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to TOU, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-19 | House | Prefiled. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1616&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1616_.HTM |