HI HB161 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts federal veterans disability benefits from seizure to enforce a court judgment, except for certain child and spousal support cases.
Title
Veterans Disability Benefits; Attachment; Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-01 | House | Re-referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 11 |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB541 (Same As) 2013-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.