HI HB1580 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant to Empower Oahu to maintain and expand the weed and seed strategy, which is a collaborative effort to reclaim, restore, and rebuild communities. Effective July 1, 2030. (SD1)
Title
Grant; Empower Oahu; Weed and Seed Strategy; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2945) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2182 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.