HI HB158 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Transportation to adopt rules that regulate and limit noise from vessels at harbors, ports, roadsteads, docks, wharves, piers, quays, bulkheads, and landings of the State.
Title
Relating To Vessels.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-02-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB158 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB15 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB15 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=158&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB158_.HTM |