HI HB1570 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to implement a pilot project to monitor radiation levels in consumer seafood and seaweed products over the next 5 years and to post periodic reports on its website. Makes an appropriation.
Title
DOH; Pilot Project; Radiation Levels; Seafood; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to OMH, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1570&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1570_.HTM |