HI HB1567 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that on 1/1/2010, treats each new skilled nursing facility or facility expanding its operations outside an enterprise zone as operating within an enterprise zone for purposes of eligibility to receive all benefits provided in enterprise zones. Adds definition of skilled nursing facility. Amends definition of medical and health care services. (SD1)
Title
Skilled Nursing Facilities; Enterprise Zone Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from EDT/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 999) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/HTH deferred the measure until 03-20-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-09 2:30 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to EDT/HTH, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 290). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Manahan, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 3-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Awana, Nishimoto. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-09 2:30 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Evans. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 02-17-09 8:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EBM. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Finnegan. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS-HLT on Thursday, 02-05-09 10:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, EBM, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |