HI HB1564 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1564
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Beach Preservation Revolving Fund within the State Treasury. Establishes a low-interest Contingent Mortgage Financing Pilot Program to encourage certain shoreline property owners to relocate mauka of expected sea level rise and erosion hazard zones. Amends coastal zone management laws to further protect against impacts of sea level rise and coastal erosion. Appropriates funds. (HB1564 HD1)
Title
Relating To Coastal Zone Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-05-19 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1564 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.